Thibert, Mark Roger (CPSO#: 52676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1077 Golf Links Rd.
Unit 4
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A3
Phone: (807) 346-5939
Fax: (807) 346-5497
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Thibert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thibert ( CPSO# 52676 )

Business Address:
4 - 1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A3
Phone Number: (807) 346-5939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ROGER THIBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 May 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)