Thicke, Brian Christopher (CPSO#: 15865)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Thicke’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Thicke engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with patients and a hospital colleague and engaged in sexual abuse of and/or sexual impropriety with patients by, among other things, making sexual and/or inappropriate comments to patients; touching patients in an inappropriate and/or sexual manner; conducting an internal examination on a patient without wearing gloves and placing the patient’s hand on his erect penis while making sexual comments.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: November 13, 2018

Hearing Status: Adjourned

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Christopher Thicke to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 23, 2018:

Dr. Thicke is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Thicke must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Thicke’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Thicke must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Thicke shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Thicke must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Thicke must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.