Thoeni, Cornelia Elisabeth (CPSO#: 114116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  22 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PEAP - Resident as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Innsbruck, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORNELIA ELISABETH THOENI may practise medicine only:

(a) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the University of Toronto to which the holder is appointed, and only as part of a system in which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the program to that clinical teaching unit;

(b) to the extent required to complete the Pre-entry Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(c) under a level of supervision that is determined to be appropriate for the holder and the program of medical education and assessment, by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the program.

(2) Dr. THOENI may not charge a fee for medical services.

(3) This certificate expires when Dr. THOENI is no longer enrolled in the Pre-entry Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1), which may be no more than twelve weeks in duration.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 Jul 2018 and expires on 22 Sep 2018, or when Dr. THOENI's enrolment in the Pre-entry Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jan 2018
PEAP - Resident - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 31 Jan 2018 to 09 Feb 2018
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018