Thomas, Cholemkeril Kuncheria (CPSO#: 54092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
58 A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls, Ontario
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: 705 258 2818
Fax: 705 258 2828
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bingham Memorial Hospital
507 8th Avenue
Matheson, ON
P0K 1N)
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0
Canada
Phone: 705 273 2424
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. K. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thomas ( CPSO# 54092 )

Business Address:
507 8th Avenue
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 273-2424

Business Address:
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-3911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHOLEMKERIL KUNCHERIA THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 21 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2001

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Thomas’ professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Thomas engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, including by failing to complete a SCERP.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)