Thomas, Jill Marie (CPSO#: 71560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. M. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomas ( CPSO# 71560 )

Business Address:
Suite 2500
1 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z3
Phone Number: (416) 712-1630

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL MARIE THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999