Thomas, Nell (CPSO#: 91096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Minden Site
Box 700
6 McPherson Road
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone: (705) 286-2500
Fax: (705) 286-2022
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nell Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Minden Site
Box 700
6 McPherson Road
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NELL THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011