Thomas, Sumesh Philip (CPSO#: 74504)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Benin, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 89 10940 Bonaventure Drive Southeast Calgary, AB T2J 5C8
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 01 Feb 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2015