Thomas, Tara Jane (CPSO#: 84999)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 1602 3001 Murworth Drive Houston, TX 77025 U.S.A
Date Received: 03 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014