Thompson, Jennifer May (CPSO#: 96062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Main Street Heath
460 Main Street East, Unit M3
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8N 1K4
Canada
Phone: 905-524-3709
Fax: 905-524-4866
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

The Health Center - Mohawk College
135 Fennel Ave West
C109
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E5
Canada
Phone: 289 237-6538
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

David Braley Athletic Center
McMaster University
280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 905-525-9140
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thompson ( CPSO# 96062 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Unit M3
460 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1K4
Phone Number: (905) 524-3709

Business Address:
135 Fennel Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E5
Phone Number: (289) 237-6538

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MAY THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016