Thompson, Kimberly Carol (CPSO#: 98021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Elm St.
Unit 104
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: 519-914-0122
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Thompson ( CPSO# 98021 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
25 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone Number: (226) 210-3773

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY CAROL THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014