Thompson, Stephen Robert (CPSO#: 96615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
925 Union Street
Bangor ME  04401
United States
Phone: (207) 973-9980
Fax: (207) 973-7515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Stephen Robert Thompson may practise medicine independently in Orthopaedic
            Surgery, only.