Thompson-Fawcett, Mark William (CPSO#: 72084)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Auckland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 05 Mar 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 1999