Thoms, John William (CPSO#: 91874)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2011