Thomson, Valerie Roberta (CPSO#: 53958)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Family Medicine records are located at: Forbes Park Medical Centre 26 Forbes Street Cambridge, ON N3C 2E2 Psychotherapy records are located at: 36 Rosecliff Court Cambridge, ON N1S 5B4
Date Received: 14 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018