Thoo, Vanessa Li-Jien (CPSO#: 105156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA LI-JIEN THOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015