Thornton, Christine Ann (CPSO#: 77620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
450 Yonge St
Barrie ON  L4N 4E2
Phone: (705) 735-3235
Fax: (705) 797-1428
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANN THORNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004