Thurgur, Lisa Dawn (CPSO#: 77853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
F Main Room M206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Fax: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Thurgur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Thurgur ( CPSO# 77853 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
F Main Room M206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA DAWN THURGUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THURGUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008