Thwin, Noreen (CPSO#: 89866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English

Education:Insitute of Medicine I, Rangoon, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-9382
Fax: (705) 746-6901
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Thwin ( CPSO# 89866 )

Business Address:
Medicine Associates Clinic
60 Bowes Street
Unit 101
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-9382

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOREEN THWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010