Thyagu, Santhosh (CPSO#: 89340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  28 Jul 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Haematology/Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5706
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Santhosh Thyagu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thyagu ( CPSO# 89340 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Haematology/Oncology
Suite 5-303D
610 University Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (647) 865-1539

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 29 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Santhosh Thyagu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Haematology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Thyagu
                        holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Thyagu  no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Thyagu's clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Thyagu's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  July  29,  2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 28, 2020.