Tibar, Khaled Dhaw (CPSO#: 76820)

Current Status: Suspended as of 23 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2008

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 23 Oct 2008


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Executive Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2008 Active

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: October 23, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 23, 2008, the certificate of registration that had been held by Dr. Khaled Dhaw Tibar was suspended by the CPSO’s Executive Committee pursuant to s. 37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code of the Regulated Health Professions Act. On July 9, 2008, the certificate of registration that had been held by Dr. Tibar expired in accordance with the terms, conditions and limitations which had been imposed on it.