Tidd, Christopher Mark (CPSO#: 85547)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Tidd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017