Tiedemann, Rodger Edwin (CPSO#: 94302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Auckland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept. Medical Oncology & Hematology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2359
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rodger E. Tiedemann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tiedemann ( CPSO# 94302 )

Business Address:
Suite 12-306
101 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2359

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 09 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rodger Edwin Tiedemann may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Hematology,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.
                        Tiedemann  holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Tiedemann
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.