Tiffney, Jennifer (CPSO#: 88432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53804
Fax: (289) 398-1067
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 53804
Fax: (905) 323-7598
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

MedSleep
Suite 204
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 374-6453
Fax: (888) 905-6992
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Region Mental Health
3550 Schmon Parkway, Suite 2
P.O.Box 1052
Thorold ON  L2V 4T7
Canada
Phone: 9059882854
Fax: 9056849798
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara College
Niagara-on-the-Lake Campus
135 Taylor Road
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Canada
Phone: (905) 641-2252 Ext. 4449
Fax: (905) 988-4321
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiffney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tiffney ( CPSO# 88432 )

Business Address:
135 Taylor Road
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Phone Number: (905) 641-2252

Business Address:
2 - 3550 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4T7
Phone Number: (905) 988-2854

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Niagara Snoring and Sleep Centre
Suite 204
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 374-6453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER TIFFNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIFFNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014