Tihal, Hirawan (CPSO#: 30852)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tihal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tihal ( CPSO# 30852 )

Business Address:
200 - 180 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4V1
Phone Number: (905) 523-0244

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Academy of Medicine 206 - 1 Young St Hamilton, ON L8N 1T8
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2018