Tiislar, Milvi Katrin (CPSO#: 88868)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiislar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2012