Tilbrook, Devon Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 84610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: 705-457-1212
Fax: 705-457-3955
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Tilbrook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tilbrook ( CPSO# 84610 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medicine Centre
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVON SARAH JANE TILBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILBROOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 21 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008