Tilley, Stephen Earl (CPSO#: 90403)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 May 2009 to 31 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010