Timko, Julie Barbara (CPSO#: 88702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Centre
A2-150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: (905) 945-4772
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 945-2253 Ext. 300
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospice Niagara
403 Ontario St #2
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Canada
Phone: 905-984-8766
Fax: 905-988-1201
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Timko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Timko ( CPSO# 88702 )

Business Address:
Family Medical Centre
Unit A2
150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 945-5424

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
403 Ontario Street
Suite 2
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Phone Number: (905) 984-8766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE BARBARA TIMKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2010