Timonera, Elizabeth Rufin (CPSO#: 83034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 62001
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1262 Don Mills Rd,
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-2166
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Timonera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH RUFIN TIMONERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMONERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Oct 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009