Ting, Ka-Hung George (CPSO#: 64482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 5666
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 6137212000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ting ( CPSO# 64482 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Radiology Department
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
Queensway Carelton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KA-HUNG GEORGE TING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991