Tirukonda, Prasanna Sivanath (CPSO#: 94643)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Madras Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 18 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 19 Feb 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2011