Tjan, Eugenie Ulrica (CPSO#: 63892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sheridan Health
Unit 44B
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone: (905) 403-9595
Fax: (905) 403-9596
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 3) 
            Dr. Tjan has been unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with her
            undertaking signed May 8, 2018.  As a result, she has ceased to practice
            palliative care medicine, as from August 30, 2018 and until she obtains a
            College approved Clinical Supervisor.


            (2 of 3)
            As from May 9, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eugenie Ulrica Tjan
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tjan to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. EUGENIE ULRICA TJAN
                                             ("Dr. Tjan")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tjan, certificate of registration number 63892, am a member of the
                  College.  




            (3)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that the College received a public complaint
                  bearing File Number 105276 and subsequently initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216051 into whether I engaged in professional
                  misconduct and/or am incompetent in my medical assistance in dying
                  ("MAID") practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that I will not engage in the practice of
                        MAID in any respect, including, but not limited to assessing
                        patients for MAID eligibility and the delivery of MAID.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that, notwithstanding this Undertaking, I
                        am required to provide patients seeking MAID with an effective
                        referral, as defined in College Policy #4-16: Medical Assistance in
                        Dying. 
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tjan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and Appendix "B",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking
                  form part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received a public complaint and subsequently
                              initiated an investigation into whether Dr. Tjan engaged in
                              professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice
                              of medical assistance in dying. As a result of the
                              investigation, Dr. Tjan must not engage in the practice of
                              medical assistance in dying (MAID) in any respect, including,
                              but not limited to assessing patients for MAID eligibility
                              and the delivery of MAID.
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Tjan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.





            (3 of 3)
            As from May 8, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eugenie Ulrica Tjan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Tjan has given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. EUGENIE ULRICA TJAN
                                             ("Dr. Tjan")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tjan, certificate of registration number 63892, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that the College received a public complaint
                  bearing File Number 105276 and subsequently initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216051 into whether I engaged in professional
                  misconduct and/or am incompetent in my medical assistance in dying
                  ("MAID") practice (the "Investigations").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").


            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations, with a focus on palliative care and end of
                              life care;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month for a minimum of
                              three (3) months. If my Clinical Supervisor recommends it and
                              the College approves, meetings shall take place once every
                              three (3) months thereafter;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least ten (10) of my palliative care charts at
                              every meeting. If ten (10) palliative care charts are not
                              available for review at a given meeting, the Clinical
                              Supervisor will review every palliative care chart. If fewer
                              than three (3) palliative care charts are available for
                              review at a given meeting, an additional meeting during which
                              at least three (3) palliative care charts are reviewed will
                              be required to complete the period of Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the medical
                        inspector dated November 13, 2017, December 11, 2017 and January
                        15, 2018, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of palliative care conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising palliative care medicine until
                        such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                        the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practicing
                        palliative care medicine as a result of section (5)(g) above this
                        will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate
                        of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the public register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   education acceptable to the College and my Clinical
                              Supervisor in palliative care practice, including end of life
                              care;
                  
                        (ii)  review and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of College
                              Policy #6-16: Planning for and Providing Quality End of Life
                              Care; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to complete this requirement within twelve
                        (12) months of the Effective Date.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my palliative care practice ("the Reassessment") by
                        an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with
                        the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (f)   I, Dr. Tjan, hereby consent to the following being included on the public
                  register as terms, conditions or limitations on my certificate of
                  registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the Code: 

                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tjan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tjan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received a public complaint and subsequently conducted
                        an investigation into whether Dr. Tjan engaged in professional
                        misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of Medical
                        Assistance in Dying. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              With respect to her palliative care practice, Dr. Tjan will
                              practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                              acceptable to the College for a minimum of 12 months. 
                              Dr. Tjan will engage in professional education in palliative
                              care practice, including end of life care.
                              Dr. Tjan's palliative care practice will be reassessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end
                              of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Tjan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Tjan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Tjan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: May 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eugenie Ulrica Tjan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 9, 2018:

The College received a public complaint and subsequently initiated an investigation into whether Dr. Tjan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of medical assistance in dying. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Tjan must not engage in the practice of medical assistance in dying (MAID) in any respect, including, but not limited to assessing patients for MAID eligibility and the delivery of MAID.


Source: Member
Active Date: May 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eugenie Ulrica Tjan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 9, 2018:

The College received a public complaint and subsequently initiated an investigation into whether Dr. Tjan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of medical assistance in dying. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Tjan must not engage in the practice of medical assistance in dying (MAID) in any respect, including, but not limited to assessing patients for MAID eligibility and the delivery of MAID.


Source: Member
Active Date: May 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eugenie Ulrica Tjan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 8, 2018:

The College received a public complaint and subsequently conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Tjan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of Medical Assistance in Dying. As a result of the investigation:

With respect to her palliative care practice, Dr. Tjan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 12 months.

Dr. Tjan will engage in professional education in palliative care practice, including end of life care.

Dr. Tjan’s palliative care practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.