To, Phuong Le (CPSO#: 67267)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Aug-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. To Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 25 2008


Corporation Name: Dr. To Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2009

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Phuong Le To Unit 3 1635 Lawrence Avenue West North York, Ontario M6L 3C9
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2009