Todaro, Carla (CPSO#: 111291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Universita Campus Bio-Medico Di Roma, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA TODARO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. TODARO is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. TODARO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TODARO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TODARO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. TODARO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. TODARO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 20 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018