Toeg, Hadi Daood Edward (CPSO#: 95839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HADI DAOOD EDWARD TOEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOEG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2019