Tole, Soumitra Shripad (CPSO#: 98078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOUMITRA SHRIPAD TOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018