Tolmie, Wendy Isobel (CPSO#: 58365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Names: Sidaway, Wendy Isobel (used until: 19 Apr 1993 )     Blanche, Wendy Isobel (used until: 21 Jul 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Shaftesbury Avenue
Guelph ON  N1E 1K4
Phone: (519) 822-1717
Fax: (519) 822-0093
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ISOBEL TOLMIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLMIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992