Toma, Alina (CPSO#: 82625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4163604000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alina Toma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toma ( CPSO# 82625 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
York ON  L4C 4Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALINA TOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010