Tomen, Mark Edward (CPSO#: 57115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
226 Wellington Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1J6
Phone: (519) 352-1250
Fax: (519) 354-2721
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

22 Mill Street
P.O. Box 760
Tilbury ON  N0P2L0
Canada
Phone: 519-682-2307
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Tomen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2013


Corporation Name: M.E. Tomen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tomen ( CPSO# 57115 )

Business Address:
226 Wellington Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1J6
Phone Number: (519) 352-1250

Business Address:
22 Mill Street West
Chatham ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-2307

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 7, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mark Edward Tomen, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tomen to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR.  MARK EDWARD TOMEN
                                          ("Dr. Tomen")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            1.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tomen, certificate of registration number 57115, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has recently assessed my care of patients for
                  whom I prescribe narcotics, and has identified some concerns in respect
                  thereof. 

            2.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts of patients for
                              whom I prescribe narcotics and/or controlled substances once
                              every month for at least the first three (3) months of my
                              Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every month for at least the first three
                              (3) months of my Clinical Supervision; 
                  
                        (iii) If, at any time after the first three (3) months of Clinical
                              Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor believes that my
                              supervision may safely be reduced to meeting and reviewing my
                              charts every three (3) months, the Clinical Supervisor shall
                              notify the College of this and I shall meet with my Clinical
                              Supervisor every three (3) months from that time forward,
                              until I have been supervised for a total of one year;  
                  
                        (iv)  Observe my interactions with patients for whom I prescribe
                              narcotics and/or controlled substances if this is desirable,
                              in the opinion of my Clinical Supervisor; 
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and/or
                              observation or other component of the Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month at the outset, and once every quarter should our
                              supervisory visits be reduced to quarterly in accordance with
                              section (iii) above, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Tomen, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under the provisions above, I
                        will cease seeing patients for whom I have prescribed narcotics
                        and/or controlled and monitored substances and shall cease
                        prescribing narcotics and/or controlled substances until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Tomen, agree that if I am required to cease seeing patients
                        for whom I prescribe narcotics and/or controlled substances and
                        cease prescribing narcotics and/or controlled and monitored
                        substances as a result of section (g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Prescribing Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tomen, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs (the "Prescribing Log") in the form set out at Appendix "B",
                        which will include at least the following information:  
                  
                              (i)   the date of the prescription;
                              (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                              (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                              (iv)  the medication dosage;
                              (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                              (vi)   the clinical indication for use and patient direction;
                                    and 
                              (vii) physician initials.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tomen, shall keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                        all Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        each of the following professional education:
                  
                              (i)   programs satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                                    1.    medical record keeping; and
                                    2.    opioid prescribing.
                  
                              (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                                    Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to complete this requirement by March 30,
                        2016, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (4) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking , and to abide by
                        those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        ICR Committee
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tomen, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tomen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Tomen, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            3.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the
                  Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  advice in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Tomen was the subject of a College review of his care and
                        treatment of patients for whom he prescribes narcotics and/or
                        controlled substances.  As a result of the review, Dr. Tomen's care
                        and treatment of such patients will be supervised, and a
                        reassessment of his practice will occur. 
                  
            4.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Tomen, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                  interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                  patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Tomen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS, and
                  any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order
                  for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Tomen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D", respectively.

            (19)  I, Dr. Tomen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 7, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mark Edward Tomen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 7, 2015:

Dr. Tomen was the subject of a College review of his care and treatment of patients for whom he prescribes narcotics and/or controlled substances. As a result of the review, Dr. Tomen’s care and treatment of such patients will be supervised, and a reassessment of his practice will occur.