Tomescu, Stefan Sebastian (CPSO#: 90706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic
Suite 343
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416-928-3279
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Tomescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tomescu ( CPSO# 90706 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic
Suite 343
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 928-3279

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN SEBASTIAN TOMESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013