Tomini, Stephen Ryan (CPSO#: 79304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Tomini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tomini ( CPSO# 79304 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P.O. Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 770-2312

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN RYAN TOMINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005