Tompkins, Brock John Frederick (CPSO#: 70097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McKinney Medical Centre
103-510 Ingersoll Ave.
Woodstock ON  N4S 4X9
Phone: (519) 539-1112
Fax: (800) 254-3630
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1499 Gordon St.
Guelph ON  N1L 1C9
Canada
Phone: 519-836-0101
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

1499 Gordon St.
Guelph ON  N1L 1C9
Canada
Phone: 519-836-0101
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BROCK JOHN FREDERICK TOMPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMPKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998