Tong, Leung Chu Bonnie (CPSO#: 87917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York-Stony Brook, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEUNG CHU BONNIE TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018