Tong, Maorong (CPSO#: 90274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese, Mandarin

Education:Bengbu Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre
Department of Hospitalists
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maorong Tong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tong ( CPSO# 90274 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Website: www.recordsolution.ca
Date Received: 02 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAORONG TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011