Tong, William Yuwa (CPSO#: 95014)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 03 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2014