Toogood, Jillian Alicia (CPSO#: 93694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Elgin Family Health Team
Unit 1
424 Talbot Street West
Aylmer ON  N5H 1K9
Phone: (519) 773-3715
Fax: (519) 765-1279
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN ALICIA TOOGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOGOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012