Toor, Jaspreet Kaur (CPSO#: 97431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Niagara Health System
65 Third St
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: 4164536476
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Toor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toor ( CPSO# 97431 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
Niagara Health System
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASPREET KAUR TOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014