Torok, Maria Theresa (CPSO#: 75319)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 19 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010