Torrance, Shona Margaret (CPSO#: 78994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Site
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynecology
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 3069
Fax: (905) 883-2052
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHONA MARGARET TORRANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORRANCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010