Torres, Carlos Hernando (CPSO#: 89506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 12036
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carlos Torres Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Torres ( CPSO# 89506 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite 554
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 19 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective: 19 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Carlos Hernando Torres may practise medicine only:

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa, in which Dr. Torres
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automaatically expires  when  Dr.  Torres
                  no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.